Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Shulman, Harry Sol (CPSO#: 20983)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shulman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre 2075 Bayview Avenue Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Date Received: 30 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jan 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017