Shum, David Ting-Wai (CPSO#: 32941)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577 Ext. 52360
Fax: (519) 254-6861
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medical Laboratories of Windsor
Windsor ON  N8X 1K4
Canada
Phone: 519-258-1991
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Medical Laboratories of Windsor
Windsor ON  N8X 1K4
Canada
Phone: 519-258-1991 Ext. 254
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Ting-Wai Shum Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Shum ( CPSO# 32941 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 03 Dec 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID TING-WAI SHUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHUM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1981