Siddall, Laura Syrene (CPSO#: 86442)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Two Rivers Family Health Team
Unit 12
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone: (519) 629-4615
Fax: (519) 629-4630
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Laura Siddall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Siddall ( CPSO# 86442 )

Business Address:
Two Rivers Family Health Team
Unit 12
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone Number: (519) 629-4615

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Feb 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA SYRENE SIDDALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDDALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2010