Sidhu, Gurpreet Singh (CPSO#: 57687)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Nov 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Nov 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Jammu University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
502 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5Y 3H7
Phone: (519) 645-6000
Fax: (519) 433-5404
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Ave E
Timmins, ON
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Canada
Phone: (705) 267-2131
Fax: (705) 264-6524
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sidhu McDowall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sidhu ( CPSO# 57687 )
Dr. M. McDowall ( CPSO# 60739 )

Business Address:
502 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5Y 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 645-6000

Business Address:
506 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5Y 3H7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GURPREET SINGH SIDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDHU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1990