Siekierski, Michal Maciej (CPSO#: 59509)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michal Siekierski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Siekierski ( CPSO# 59509 )

Business Address:
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAL MACIEJ SIEKIERSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIEKIERSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1989