Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Silverman, Michael Seth (CPSO#: 55442)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room B3-414
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6311
Fax: 519 646 6328
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Silverman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Silverman ( CPSO# 55442 )

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 05 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL SETH SILVERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVERMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1992