Silverstein, Carol Suzanne (CPSO#: 65400)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Suite 260
North York ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 497-6363
Fax: (416) 497-7610
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carol Silverstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Silverstein ( CPSO# 65400 )

Business Address:
Suite 260
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Toronto ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone Number: (416) 497-6363

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROL SUZANNE SILVERSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVERSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993