Simantirakis, Emmanuel (CPSO#: 66086)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Nov 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:McGill University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
Radiology Department
713 Montreal Road
Vanier ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 4527
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Simantirakis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Simantirakis ( CPSO# 66086 )

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-7878

Business Address:
705 MacKay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
Radiology Department
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 719-0553

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 03 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMMANUEL SIMANTIRAKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMANTIRAKIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1992