Simmons, Brian Stephen (CPSO#: 62916)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Dec 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Southampton, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Women & Babies Program
M4 224
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 87793
Fax: (416) 480-5613
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Simmons Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Simmons ( CPSO# 62916 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Women and Babies Program
M4 224
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN STEPHEN SIMMONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMMONS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 1998