Simms, Richard James (CPSO#: 31486)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 May 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 May 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
PO Box 4000
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone: (705) 435-6281
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simms Omylanowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Simms ( CPSO# 31486 )
Dr. D. Omylanowski ( CPSO# 29667 )

Business Address:
Carmen Vanderwater Medical Centre
Unit 33
180 Parsons Road
Alliston ON  L9R 1E8
Phone Number: (705) 435-6225

Business Address:
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
Department of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
PO Box 4000
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone Number: (705) 435-6281

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 12 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD JAMES SIMMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMMS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2015