Simpson, Diane Lorraine (CPSO#: 55358)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 May 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
General Site
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-0271
Fax: (905) 545-6232
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Diane L. Simpson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Simpson ( CPSO# 55358 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
General Site
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Oct 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANE LORRAINE SIMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMPSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 31 Mar 1988
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1987