Simpson, Ewurabena Akonuah (CPSO#: 82710)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CHEO
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ewurabena A. Simpson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Simpson ( CPSO# 82710 )

Business Address:
Childrens Hosptial of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EWURABENA AKONUAH SIMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMPSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2012