Sinclair, Douglas Earle (CPSO#: 54576)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Nov 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room 1 028 Bond Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Douglas Sinclair Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sinclair ( CPSO# 54576 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 557-7702

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist
Emergency Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS EARLE SINCLAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINCLAIR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Nov 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2009