Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Singal, Sewa Ram (CPSO#: 64152)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjabi University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
2115 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V6
Phone: (416) 741-6111
Fax: (416) 741-6121
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2640 Rutherford Road
Suite 102
Vaughan ON  L4K 0H3
Canada
Phone: 905-417-3001
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

1209 King Street West
Unit 5
Toronto ON  M6K 1G2
Canada
Phone: 416-536-2500
Fax: 416-532-7006
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

North York Diagnostic and Cardiac C
250 Marlee Avenue
Toronto ON  M6B 3H7
Canada
Phone: (416)783-0000
Fax: (416) 783-0002
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

North York Diagnostic and Cardiac C
250 Marlee Avenue
Toronto ON  M6B 3H7
Canada
Phone: (416)783-0000
Fax: (416) 783-0002
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sewa Ram Singal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Singal ( CPSO# 64152 )

Business Address:
250 Marlee Avenue
North York ON  M6B 3H7
Phone Number: (416) 783-0000

Business Address:
1209 King Street West
Unit 5
Toronto ON  H9K 1G2
Phone Number: (416) 536-2500

Business Address:
York-Finch Professional Building
200 - 2115 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 741-6111

Business Address:
Suite 109
812 Britannia Road West
Mississauga ON  L5V 0A6
Phone Number: (905) 812-0777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEWA RAM SINGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Sep 1992
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jul 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1996
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Jul 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1996