Singh, Abhay Kumar (CPSO#: 71882)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Nalanda Medical College, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute Mental Health
550 Wellington Road
London,On.
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 455-5110 Ext. 47581
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 206
450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Canada
Phone: (519) 936-1166
Fax: (519) 913-4395
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock
Ontario
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Canada
Phone: (519) 421-4223
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Singh and Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Singh ( CPSO# 71882 )
Dr. S. Singh ( CPSO# 73383 )

Business Address:
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4223

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
Suite 206
450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone Number: (519) 936-1166

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABHAY KUMAR SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Aug 1997 to 21 Nov 1997
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Nov 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1998