Singh, Amarendra Narayan (CPSO#: 32412)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Bihar University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1299 Waterside Way
Kingston ON  K7K 7J8
Phone: (613) 531-4472
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amarendra Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 14 2012

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMARENDRA NARAYAN SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1981