Singh, Davindra (CPSO#: 67749)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
AvantDerm
45 Mill Street
Toronto ON  M5A 3R6
Phone: (416) 869-3376
Fax: (416) 365-7546
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Canada
Phone: (705) 267-2131
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Davindra Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Singh ( CPSO# 67749 )

Business Address:
45 Mill Street
Toronto ON  M5A 3R6
Phone Number: (416) 869-3376

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVINDRA SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1996