Singh, Kirandeep (CPSO#: 95193)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jun 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saint James School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: 4162421000
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1235 Wilson Ave
Urgent Medical Care Clinic
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: 4162421000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kirandeep Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Singh ( CPSO# 95193 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 917-3155


Corporation Name: Neel Chauhan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Nov 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Jul 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Kirandeep  Singh may practice medicine independently in internal medicine,
            only.