Singh, Kunwar Raj (CPSO#: 24370)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Feb 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 May 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Spanish, Telugu, Urdu

Education:Osmania University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
483 East Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 6Y7
Phone: (519) 336-6311
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kunwar Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Singh ( CPSO# 24370 )

Business Address:
483 East Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 6Y7
Phone Number: (519) 336-6311

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1991
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Dec 1996
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 28 Feb 1997
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 May 2003
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 23 Sep 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 23 Sep 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from September 23, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Kunwar Raj Singh, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Singh to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. KUNWAR RAJ SINGH
                                          ("Dr. Singh")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Singh, certificate of registration number 24370, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Singh, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it. 

            (4)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Singh, undertake that, in or around December 2016, I will
                        submit to a Reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an
                        assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").
                        I acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may include a chart
                        review, direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues
                        and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Singh, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking, and to abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the ICR
                        Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Singh, acknowledge and agree that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Singh, understand and agree that if I am of the view that
                        any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will
                        have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations
                        within which to provide the College with my submissions in this
                        regard.  I further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR
                        Committee will consider my submissions and make a determination
                        regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are
                        reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute
                        limitations or restrictions on my practice, and that decision will
                        be provided to me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Singh, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (5)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Singh, hereby consent to any of the following being included
                        on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice;  
                  
                        (ii)  any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (5)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (5)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Singh, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Singh, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Singh, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Singh, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Singh, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Singh, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Singh, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Singh, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking
                  shall be information on the College's Register that is available to the
                  public during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (11)  I, Dr. Singh, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        The College received information about Dr. Singh's standard of
                        practice. As a result, Dr. Singh's practice will be reassessed by
                        an assessor selected by the College in or around December 2016.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Singh, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (13)  I, Dr. Singh, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (14)  I, Dr. Singh, give my irrevocable consent to any Chiefs of Staff and
                  Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the Reassessment; and/or
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  
            As from January 14, 2013,  the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Kunwar Raj Singh, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Singh to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Kunwar Raj Singh's practice is subject to the following terms,
                  conditions and limitations:
                  
                  (a)   Dr. Singh shall not have any in-person professional encounters with
                        female 
                        patients, or the female parents or caregivers of patients, at any
                        practice location except in the presence of a female chaperone who
                        is a member of a registered health profession pursuant to the
                        Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 191 c. 18 as amended
                        and is acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of
                        Ontario; and 

                  (b)   Dr. Singh's practice is restricted to Paediatrics.  He shall not
                        treat anyone over 18 years old. 

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Aug 1994
Summary:

 In August 1994, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Kunwar Raj Singh guilty of  professional 
 misconduct, as defined in s. 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he engaged 
 in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
 circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that he be reprimanded, with the fact of the 
 reprimand to be recorded on the Register.  The Committee also ruled that Dr. Singh's licence to 
 practice be suspended for a period of six months, with the last three months of the suspension to 
 be themselves suspended provided that he pursued and completed, at the direction of, and to the 
 satisfaction of the Registrar, a course of study in medical ethics.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 01 Oct 1996
Hearing Date(s): Aug 25, 1994


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 27 Nov 1991
Summary:

 In November 1991, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Kunwar Raj Singh guilty of professional 
 misconduct, as defined in s. 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he engaged 
 in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
 circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Singh be reprimanded, with the fact 
 of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.  The Committee further ruled that the Doctor's 
 licence to practice be suspended for a period of two years.  The final eighteen months of this 
 period of suspension, however, would themselves be suspended provided that Dr. Singh meet the 
 following conditions:  (a) that he not be referred to the Discipline Committee and found guilty of 
 a similar act of professional misconduct with a parent of a patient or staff member of a health 
 facility or hospital in the four year period after this Order became final; and (b) that if Dr. 
 Singh were referred to the Discipline Committee on a similar act of professional misconduct, he 
 would either agree to the expeditious hearing of the charges within sixty days of receipt of the 
 Notice of Hearing setting out the charges; or would agree to the suspension of his practice until 
 the disposition of the charges against him.

Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): 11 Sep 1991

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 23, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Kunwar Raj Singh to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 23, 2016:

The College received information about Dr. Singh’s standard of practice. As a result, Dr. Singh’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College in or around December 2016.