Singh, Ranjit (CPSO#: 28606)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ranjit Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Singh ( CPSO# 28606 )

Business Address:
Suite 301
Norfolk Medical Centre
85 Norfolk Street
Guelph ON  N1H 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 836-5940

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 25 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Apr 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RANJIT SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1976