Singh, Simron (CPSO#: 73810)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Alberta, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Sunnybrook Regional
Cancer Center
T Wing
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4928
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simron Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Singh ( CPSO# 73810 )

Business Address:
Toronto Sunnybrook Regional
Cancer Centre
T Wing
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4928

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMRON SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jul 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2006