Sinuff, Tasnim (CPSO#: 67758)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room D.108
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 2895
Fax: (416) 480-4999
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sinuff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Sinuff ( CPSO# 67758 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room D108
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 26 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TASNIM SINUFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINUFF is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998