Sion, David (CPSO#: 52260)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Mar 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Feb 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone: (519) 977-8757
Fax: (226) 674-0837
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sion Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sion ( CPSO# 52260 )

Business Address:
210 - 2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone Number: (519) 977-8757

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Plastic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID SION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SION is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Mar 1983 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 1986