Sitaram, Kadambi Parthasarathy (CPSO#: 45328)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Oct 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Mysore Medical College, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Centrepointe Drive
Suite 305
Nepean ON  K2G 6E2
Phone: (613) 723-5865
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kadambi P. Sitaram Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sitaram ( CPSO# 45328 )

Business Address:
305 - 1 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone Number: (613) 723-5865

Business Address:
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4851

Business Address:
Pembroke General Hospital
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-3675

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 26 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KADAMBI PARTHASARATHY SITARAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SITARAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1987