Siu, King Fun (CPSO#: 74220)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bay-College Medical Clinic
Unit 216C
777 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C8
Phone: (416) 977-8878
Fax: (416) 977-0118
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. F. Siu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Siu ( CPSO# 74220 )

Business Address:
Bay College Medical Clinic
Unit C216
P.O. Box 135
777 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C8
Phone Number: (416) 977-8878

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KING FUN SIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Aug 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 02 Jan 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2001