Sivarajah, Kalawathy (CPSO#: 81538)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese, Tamil

Education:University of Peradeniya, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kalawathy Sivarajah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 29 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
Assessment Verification Period - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014