Sivasundaram, Ramanan (CPSO#: 79961)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Jaffna, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ramanan Sivasundaram Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 15 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2014