Skeldon, Simon Christopher (CPSO#: 51779)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Nov 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
190 Sherway Drive
Suite 410
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone: (416) 620-1685
Fax: (416) 620-1755
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Simon C. Skeldon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Skeldon ( CPSO# 111330)
Dr. S. Omotani ( CPSO# 51313 )
Dr. S. Skeldon ( CPSO# 51779 )

Business Address:
410 - 190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone Number: (416) 620-1685

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 19 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMON CHRISTOPHER SKELDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKELDON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1987