Skendaj, Evis (CPSO#: 88360)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Albanian, English, Italian

Education:Universiteti i Tiranes, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Oak Clinic
2524 Third line
Unit C2
Oakville ON  L6M 0G8
Phone: (905) 827 7000
Fax: (905) 827 7755
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Skendaj Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Skendaj ( CPSO# 88360 )

Business Address:
Royal Oak Clinic
C2 - 2524 Third Line
Oakville ON  L6M 0G8
Phone Number: (905) 827-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jan 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EVIS SKENDAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKENDAJ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 10 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2011