Skillman, Jean Lillian (CPSO#: 24888)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Two Rivers Family Health Team Inc
Hespeler Clinic
Unit 12
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone: (519) 629-4615 Ext. 224
Fax: (519) 629-4630
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jean Skillman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Skillman ( CPSO# 24888 )

Business Address:
Hespeler Clinic
B12 - 350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone Number: (519) 629-4615

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN LILLIAN SKILLMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKILLMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1972