Skotnicki Grant, Sandra Mary (CPSO#: 66722)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: Skotnicki, Sandra Mary (used until: 22 Jul 1997 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bay Dermatology Centre
Suite 536
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 515-8808
Fax: (416) 515-8805
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Michaels Hospital
Occupational Medicine
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: (416) 864-5074
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sandy Skotnicki - Grant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Skotnicki Grant ( CPSO# 66722 )

Business Address:
790 Bay Street
Suite 536
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 515-8808

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRA MARY SKOTNICKI GRANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKOTNICKI GRANT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1997