Skrastins, Roland (CPSO#: 32352)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 May 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Latvian

Education:Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
The Chest Centre
Toronto East Health Network
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-7777
Fax: (416) 469-7717
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roland Skrastins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Skrastins ( CPSO# 32352 )
Dr. F. Jamieson ( CPSO# 53993 )

Business Address:
The Respiratory Centre
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-7777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 20 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROLAND SKRASTINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKRASTINS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1981