Slatkovsky, Karen Emma (CPSO#: 72440)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, French, Slovak

Education:McGill University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 837-6440
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Levytsky and Slatkovsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Slatkovsky ( CPSO# 72440 )
Dr. A. Levytsky ( CPSO# 68863 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 837-6440

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre Guelph
100 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5H8
Phone Number: (519) 824-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Joseph's Health Centre,Guelph Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jul 2000 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN EMMA SLATKOVSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLATKOVSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 13 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jul 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2000