Slavchenko, Paul Taras (CPSO#: 53856)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 3312
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Slavchenko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Slavchenko ( CPSO# 53856 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 23 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL TARAS SLAVCHENKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLAVCHENKO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 31 Dec 1986
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1988