Sleeth, Sean Peter (CPSO#: 65335)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
691 Havelock Street
Lucknow ON  N0G 2H0
Phone: (519) 528-2810
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2 Janet Street
Teeswater ON  N0G 2S0
Canada
Phone: 519 392-6813
County: County of Bruce
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sleeth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sleeth ( CPSO# 65335 )

Business Address:
Wingham and District Hospital
270 Carling Terrace
Wingham ON  N0G 2W0
Phone Number: (519) 357-3210

Business Address:
Lucknow Medical Clinic
691 Havelock Street
Lucknow ON  N0G 2H0
Phone Number: (519) 528-2810

Business Address:
2 Janet Street
Teeswater ON  N0G 2S0
Phone Number: (519) 392-6813

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEAN PETER SLEETH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLEETH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993