Sloan, Eileen Patricia (CPSO#: 73895)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
9th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 8325
Fax: (416) 586-8654
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Sleep Institute
586 Eglinton Avenue East, Suite 507
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Canada
Phone: (416) 488-6980
Fax: (416) 488-3998
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EILEEN PATRICIA SLOAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLOAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004