Sloan, Kevin Patrick (CPSO#: 65393)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
532 Lake Street
Suite 102
St Catharines ON  L2N 4H4
Phone: (905) 646-2255
Fax: (905) 646-2033
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Sloan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sloan ( CPSO# 65393 )

Business Address:
Suite 102
532 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 4H4
Phone Number: (905) 646-2255

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 24 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN PATRICK SLOAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLOAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993