Smallman, Thomas Victor (CPSO#: 53642)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Nov 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Nov 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:McMaster University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
77 Nelson Street
Auburn NY  13021
United States
Phone: (315) 252-7353
Fax: (315) 554-8184
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3 Chestnut Circle
Skaneateles NY  13152-1301
United States
Phone: (315) 415-0612
Fax: (315) 554-8185
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS VICTOR SMALLMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMALLMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1983