Smith, Deborah Lee (CPSO#: 59409)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7147
Fax: (705) 671-7392
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-7147
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deborah and Robert Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Smith ( CPSO# 59409 )
Dr. R. Smith ( CPSO# 59944 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH LEE SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1989