Smith, Edward James (CPSO#: 33838)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Dec 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Feb 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
150 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1L 8H2
Phone: (613) 748-1113
Fax: (613) 748-1639
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward J. Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Smith ( CPSO# 33838 )

Business Address:
109 - 460 St. Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1K 4Z2
Phone Number: (613) 748-1113

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1982
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 08 Feb 2018

Pending Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Smith’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Smith engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in performing and billing for Level 2 procedures, that can only be performed in an approved Out-of-Hospital premises, without having the required approval; renting his unapproved premises to another physician who performed Level 2 procedures and misleading the College’s Out-of-Hospital program.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): July 16-18, 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 08 Feb 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from 12:01 a.m., February 8, 2018, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints and
            Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the
            following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of
            registration held by Dr. Edward James Smith:

            Practice Restriction
                  
            (i)   Dr. Smith shall not perform any procedures that can only be performed in
                  an Out of Hospital Premises as defined in Ontario Regulation 114/94, made
                  under the Medicine Act, 1991.

            (ii)  Dr. Smith shall provide the College with the addresses of all locations
                  where he practices ("Practice Location(s)").  If he commences practice at
                  a new location subsequently, he shall provide to the College the address
                  of the new Practice Location(s) within five (5) days of commencing
                  practice at that location.

            (iii) Dr. Smith will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections
                  of his Practice Location(s) and to any other activity the College deems
                  necessary in order to monitor his compliance with the provisions of this
                  Order.

            (iv)  Dr. Smith will provide to the College his irrevocable consent in the form
                  attached at Appendix "B", to permit the College to make enquiries of OHIP
                  in order  to monitor his compliance with the terms of this Order.

            (v)   Dr. Smith acknowledges that a breach by him of any provision of this
                  Order may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.