Smith, Karen Ann (CPSO#: 68966)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Dec 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 876-5076
Fax: (705) 876-5160
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Smith ( CPSO# 68966 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5076

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN ANN SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 08 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2000