Smith, Robert George (CPSO#: 69504)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: Wiens, Robert George (used until: 25 Jun 1998 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Forces Health Services Cen
CFB Kingston
PO Box 17000 Stn Forces
Kingston ON  K7K 7B4
Phone: (613) 541-5010 Ext. 5776
Fax: (613) 541-4607
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dr. R. Smith Private Practise
Olympus Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M5S3
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT GEORGE SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000