Smith, Roger Macleod Laing (CPSO#: 55101)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jan 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
3 M C 428
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 2583
Fax: (416) 603-4257
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. Roger Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 23 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. Roger M.L. Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Smith ( CPSO# 55101 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
3MC-428
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROGER MACLEOD LAING SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1986