Smith, Ruth Elaine (CPSO#: 55359)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Oct 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 111
21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone: (905) 277-2933
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Juravinski Hospital (HHSC)
Department of Rehabilitation Med
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 389-4411 Ext. 42155
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ruth E. Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Smith ( CPSO# 55359 )

Business Address:
Suite 111
21 Queensway West
Toronto ON  L5B 1B6
Phone Number: (905) 277-2933

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 05 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUTH ELAINE SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1986