Smitheringale, Alma Julia Eileen (CPSO#: 33792)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Nov 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Nov 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of London, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 11
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2W2
Phone: (416) 226-5012
Fax: (416) 226-5010
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alma Smitheringale Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Smitheringale ( CPSO# 33792 )

Business Address:
11 - 1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 226-5012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 12 Sep 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALMA JULIA EILEEN SMITHERINGALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITHERINGALE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 1982