So, Dominic Cho Yee (CPSO#: 65404)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Doctors Office
Unit 9
6400 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga ON  L5N 3E7
Phone: (905) 821-1406
Fax: (905) 821-1409
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dominic So Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. So ( CPSO# 65404 )

Business Address:
The Doctors Office
Unit 9
6400 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga ON  L5N 3E7
Phone Number: (905) 821-1406

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOMINIC CHO YEE SO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1993