Sohal, Barjinder Singh (CPSO#: 87410)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
799 Bloor Street West - 3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M6G 1L8
Phone: (647) 349-0053
Fax: (647) 349-0063
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barjinder Singh Sohal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Sohal ( CPSO# 87410 )

Business Address:
3rd Floor
799 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6G 1L8
Phone Number: (647) 349-0053

Business Address:
343 College Street
Main Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 1S5
Phone Number: (416) 915-9285

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARJINDER SINGH SOHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOHAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2007

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 27, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)