Sohn, Adrian Brett Todd (CPSO#: 56175)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Mar 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hausa

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adrian Sohn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 3 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: 83 Dawson Rd Guelph ON N1H 1B1
Date Received: 21 Mar 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Mar 2018