Soicher, Avrum Aron (CPSO#: 62293)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1991

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 216
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Phone: (905) 456-3699 Ext. 28
Fax: (905) 456-8768
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Avrum Soicher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cooper ( CPSO# 58248 )
Dr. A. Soicher ( CPSO# 62293 )

Business Address:
Suite 216
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Phone Number: (905) 456-3699

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 14 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AVRUM ARON SOICHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOICHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On December 9, 2015, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Avrum Aron Soicher in respect to an incident that took place in February 2005.