Sokol, Lorne Wayne (CPSO#: 55503)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Mar 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 May 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 111
1649 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 3L9
Phone: (416) 654-9993
Fax: (416) 654-3432
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lorne Sokol Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Sokol ( CPSO# 55503 )

Business Address:
111 - 1649 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 654-9993

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORNE WAYNE SOKOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOKOL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2011
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2011
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Mar 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2013

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Nov 2011
Summary:

On November 16, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Lorne Wayne Sokol committed 
an act of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant 
to his suitability to practise. 
 
On or about December 14, 2009, Dr. Sokol pleaded guilty in the Ontario Court of Justice and 
was found guilty of submitting billings to the Ontario Health Insurance Plan ("OHIP") that did 
not comply with the requirements of the Schedule of Benefits, thereby committing an offence 
under the Health Insurance Act, R.S.O. 1990, c. H.6, contrary to section 44(1)(a). The conviction 
related to the period from approximately March 1, 2003 to February 15, 2007.   
 
In light of submissions made by the parties, and acknowledging that Dr. Sokol had made a 
significant repayment of the amount owing to the Workplace Safety and Insurance Board and to 
OHIP, totalling $3,511,356.62, the Court imposed a sentence that included a fine of $25,000.00, 
plus the victim fine surcharge of $6,250, payable in 7 days.   
 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    The Registrar suspend Dr. Sokol's certificate of registration for a period of three (3) 
      months, to commence at 12:01 a.m. on December 1, 2011. 
 
2.    The Registrar impose the following specified terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. 
      Sokol's certificate of registration: 
 
      a)    Dr. Sokol shall, at his own expense, participate in and successfully complete an 
            educational program in ethics approved by the College; 
 
      b)    For a period of one year, the College may request information from the Ontario 
            Health Insurance Plan (OHIP) and/or the Ministry of Health and Long Term Care 
            in order for the College to monitor Dr. Sokol's OHIP billings and to ensure his 
            compliance with the Health Insurance Act;  
 
      c)    In order to facilitate the College's monitoring, specified in paragraph 2(b), Dr. 
            Sokol shall execute a Consent in the form attached at Appendix "A" to this Order, 
            and shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and patient 
            charts by a College representative(s) for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing 
            his compliance with the terms of this Order. 
 
3.    Dr. Sokol appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
 
4.    Dr. Sokol pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00, within 30 days of the date 
      of this Order. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): November 16, 2011